EP0380040 - Broadcaster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rauch Landmaschinenfabrik GmbH Postfach D-76545 Sinzheim / DE | [1990/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rauch, Norbert Bergseestrasse 49 D-7573 Sinzheim / DE | [1992/48] |
Former [1990/31] | 01 /
Rauch Norbert Bergseestrasse 49 DE-7573 Sinzheim / DE | Representative(s) | Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101257.5 | 23.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | DE19893902000 | 24.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3902000 | DE19893924328 | 22.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3924328 | [1990/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0380040 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0380040 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01C17/00 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
A01C17/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/31] | Title | German: | Schleuderstreuer | [1990/31] | English: | Broadcaster | [1990/31] | French: | Epandeur centrifuge | [1990/31] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 09.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2211839 (NODET GOUGIS [FR]); | [A]EP0117005 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]); | [A]GB1130539 (LELY NV C VAN DER); | [A]US2766872 (RUSSELL PILLSBURY) |