EP0381080 - Pasting device for a glue machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seki, Yukuharu, c/o Mihara Machinery Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 5007, Itozaki-cho Mihara-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Maruyama, Yoshiaki, c/o Mihara Machinery Works Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 5007, Itozaki-cho Mihara-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101606.3 | 26.01.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | JP19890010791U | 02.02.1989 Original published format: JP 1079189 U | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0381080 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0381080 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B05C1/08 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
B05C1/0821 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/32] | Title | German: | Auftragsvorrichtung für eine Klebemaschine | [1990/32] | English: | Pasting device for a glue machine | [1990/32] | French: | Dispositif d'enduit pour une machine d'encollage | [1990/32] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/03] | 25.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3989936 ; | [E]EP0362423 ; | [A]GB1145533 |