EP0380138 - Method of forming optical waveguide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oyoshi, Keiji, c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. No. 5-11 Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101626.1 | 26.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | JP19890017071 | 26.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1707189 | JP19890315961 | 05.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31596189 | [1990/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0380138 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0380138 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0380138 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
C03C23/0055 (EP,US);
G02B6/1347 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines optischen Wellenleiters | [1990/31] | English: | Method of forming optical waveguide | [1990/31] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un guide d'ondes | [1990/31] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.08.1994 | DE | 01.12.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/34] | DE | 01.12.1994 | |
FR | 27.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/15] | DE | 01.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 43, no. 6, September 1983, NEW YORK US pages 519 - 520; I.K. NAIK: 'Low-loss integrated optical waveguides fabricated by nitogen ion implantation ' | [A] - PHYSICA. vol. 88, no. 193, 1985, AMSTERDAM NL pages 193 - 205; S. JETSCHKE ET AL.: 'Diffusion and recrystallization processes during annealing of N+- and P+- implanted LiNbO3 ' | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 22, no. 1, January 1, 1973, NEW YORK US pages 5 - 7; D.T.Y. WEI ET AL.: 'Quartz optical waveguide by ion implantation ' |