EP0384161 - Device for mounting a tool on a shaft in a rotary machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. Martin 22, Rue Decomberousse, B.P. 4049 F-69615 Villeurbanne Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | For all designated states S.A. MARTIN 22, Rue Decomberousse, B.P. 4049 F-69615 Villeurbanne Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capdeboscq, Bernard Au Picard F-38540 St. Just Chaleyssin / FR | [1990/35] | Representative(s) | Colomb, Claude BOBST S.A., Service des Brevets, Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Colomb, Claude BOBST S.A., Service des Brevets, Case Postale CH-1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [1990/35] | Colomb, Claude BOBST S.A., Service des Brevets, Case Postale CH-1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 90101671.7 | 27.01.1990 | [1990/35] | Priority number, date | FR19890002729 | 24.02.1989 Original published format: FR 8902729 | [1990/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0384161 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0384161 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/26, B26F1/44 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
B26D7/2614 (EP,US);
B26D2007/2607 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7024 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7069 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4795 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9377 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9466 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/35] | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung für ein Werkzeug auf den Walzen einer umlaufenden Maschine | [1993/08] | English: | Device for mounting a tool on a shaft in a rotary machine | [1990/35] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'une forme d'usinage sur un cylindre porte-outil dans une machine rotative | [1990/35] |
Former [1990/35] | Befestigungsvorrichtung für die Werkzeuge auf den Walzen einer umlaufenden Maschine | Examination procedure | 27.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 13.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE432026 (ROESSLER & PONNDORF); | [Y]US1985628 (HORTON ALBERT J); | [A]US2187293 (WISE WOOD HENRY A, et al); | [Y]US3119312 (HENC EDWARD V) |