EP0381119 - Image sensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohara, Eiji, c/o Tamagawa Jigyosho Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 770 Shimonoge Takatsu-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/32] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101730.1 | 29.01.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | JP19890024420 | 01.02.1989 Original published format: JP 2442089 | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0381119 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0381119 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0381119 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/73 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
H04N23/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/32] | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmegerät | [1990/32] | English: | Image sensing device | [1990/32] | French: | Dispositif capteur d'image | [1990/32] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 21.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 07.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP54095119 ; | [A]JP62239780 ; | [A]JP60208189 ; | [Y]US4628362 (WAEHNER GLENN C [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 117 (E-141), 29th September 1979; & JP-A-54 095 119 (HITACHI DENSHI LTD) 27-07-1979, & JP54095119 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 111 (E-598)[2958], 8th April 1988; & JP-A-62 239 780 (CASIO COMPUT. CO., LTD) 20-10-1987, & JP62239780 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 58 (E-386)[2115], 7th March 1986; & JP-A-60 208 189 (CANON K.K.) 19-10-1985, & JP60208189 A 00000000 |