EP0439645 - Method for the controlled feeding of thermal destruction plants for urban and/or special refuse, and the plant for implementing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OFFICINE METALMECCANICHE NOVA S.P.A. Via Assunta 61 20054 Nova Milanese (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states OFFICINE METALMECCANICHE NOVA S.P.A. Via Assunta 61 I-20054 Nova Milanese, Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torlasco, Bruno Via Ariosto 26 I-20145 Milan / IT | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Giambrocono, Alfonso, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90101757.4 | 30.01.1990 | [1991/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439645 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/02, F23G7/00, B09B3/00 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
B09B3/00 (EP);
B09B3/40 (US);
B09B3/0075 (EP);
F23G5/02 (EP);
B09B2101/65 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur gesteuerten Zuführung von Stadt- und/oder Sondermüll in einer Verbrennungsanlage und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1991/32] | English: | Method for the controlled feeding of thermal destruction plants for urban and/or special refuse, and the plant for implementing the method | [1991/32] | French: | Procédé pour l'alimentation commandée de déchets urbains et/ou spéciaux dans une installation d'incinération et installation pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1991/32] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 06.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4133273 (GLENNON THOMAS J); | [A]DE2845763 (GOEPFERT PETER) | [Y] - HYDROCARBON PROCESSING. April 1979, HOUSTON US pages 183 - 192; H.W. Fabian et al: "How Bayer incinerates waste" | [A] - INGENIEURSBLAD. vol. 42, no. 5, 1 March 1973, ANTWERPEN BE pages 129 - 132; J. Coeklebergh: "De verbranding als verwerkingsmetode van vaste industriële afvalstoffen" |