EP0381222 - Decoder for subsampled video signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 18, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [1990/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masumoto, Takahiko No. 302 1-10-12 Hattori Kotobuki-cho, Toyonaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/32] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90102031.3 | 01.02.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | JP19890026303 | 03.02.1989 Original published format: JP 2630389 | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0381222 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0381222 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/12 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
H04N7/015 (EP,US);
H04N19/587 (KR);
H04N7/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Decodierung eines unterabgetasteten Videosignals | [1990/32] | English: | Decoder for subsampled video signal | [1990/32] | French: | Dispositif pour décoder un signal vidéo souséchantillonné | [1990/32] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 24.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP01233825 ; | [A]JP60217778 ; | [AD]JP62053081 ; | [AD]US4692801 (NINOMIYA YUICHI [JP], et al) | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 561 (E-859) 13 December 1989; & JP-A-01 233 825 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) 19 September 1989, & JP01233825 A 19890919 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 69 (E-389) 18 March 1986; & JP-A-60 217 778 (HITACHI) 31 October 1985, & JP60217778 A 19851031 | [A] - TOSHIBA REVIEW, no. 152, 1985, TOKYO, JP; pages 38 - 41; SINICHIRO TAGUCHI: 'High-Definition TV Receiver - A Newly-Developed MUSE Receiver and 40-inch CRT Display' | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 240 (E-529) 06 August 1987; & JP-A-62 053 081 (NEC HOME ELECTRONICS) 07 March 1987, & JP62053081 A 19870307 |