EP0381244 - Spreader roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmoock, Helmuth Büchener Weg 121 D-21481 Lauenburg / DE | [1990/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Heldt, Gert Rechtsanwalt - Patentanwalt Holstenwall 10 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Heldt, Gert, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Neuer Wall 59 III D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90102207.9 | 05.02.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | DE19893903161 | 03.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3903161 | [1990/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0381244 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0381244 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0381244 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H23/025 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
B65H23/0256 (EP);
F16C13/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/32] | Title | German: | Breitstreckwalze | [1990/32] | English: | Spreader roll | [1990/32] | French: | Rouleau d'étirage transversal | [1990/32] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 06.10.1993 | LU | 28.02.1994 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60191955 ; | [A]DE2630335 (BOETTCHER FA FELIX); | [A]GB1558465 (MASSON SCOTT THRISSELL ENG LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 40 (M-454)(2097) 18 Februar 1986, & JP-A-60 191955 (FUJI PATSUKU SYSTEM) 30 September 1985,, & JP60191955 A 19850930 |