EP0383156 - Process for eliminating phosphates and organically bound phosphorus from waste and feed waters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 6566-1024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 6566-1024 / US | ||
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 60563-1198 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehmkuhl, Josef Im Klingen 38 D-6238 Hofheim/Taunus / DE | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Hartmann, Günter, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Hartmann, Günter, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN BECKER, Patentanwälte, Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/03] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Ruschke & Partner Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/34] | Rotter, Ulrich, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90102316.8 | 06.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | DE19893904575 | 15.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3904575 | [1990/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0383156 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383156 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/52, C01F7/04 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
C02F3/1215 (EP);
C01F7/04 (EP);
C02F1/5236 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/44] |
Former [1990/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Eliminierung von Phosphaten und organisch gebundenem Phosphor aus Abwässern und Zulaufwässern | [1990/34] | English: | Process for eliminating phosphates and organically bound phosphorus from waste and feed waters | [1990/34] | French: | Procédé pour l'élimination de phosphates et de phosphores organiquement liés des eaux résiduaires et d'adduction | [1992/26] |
Former [1990/34] | Procédé pour l'élimination de phosphates et de phosphores organiquement lié des eaux résiduaires et d'adduction | Examination procedure | 16.02.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK | 08.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 08.11.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.1992
22.10.1992
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Frankfurt Werk Knapsack Patentabteilung D-50354 Hürth / DE | 02
22.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Interal Vertriebs GmbH waldstr. 12 5632 Wermelskirchen / DE Opponent's representative Neumann, Joachim Postfach 10 09 45 51309 Leverkusen / DE | 03
24.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Reitzner, Bruno Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | 04
24.03.1993
13.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Scandex Aluminium N.V. Nijverheidsweg 9 - P.O. Box 102 NL 9600 AC Hoogezand / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Martin Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | 05
24.03.1993
27.04.1993
ADMISSIBLE Alcon Aluminium Consult GmbH Benrather Schlossallee 71 D 4000 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Rabus, Werner W. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | 06
22.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Giulini Chemie GmbH Postfach 15 04 80 D-67029 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Zellentin & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rubensstraße 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 07
20.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Solvay Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 220 D-30002 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.1992
22.10.1992
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Frankfurt Werk Knapsack Patentabteilung D-50354 Hürth / DE | ||
02
22.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Interal Vertriebs GmbH waldstr. 12 5632 Wermelskirchen / DE Opponent's representative Neumann, Joachim Postfach 10 09 45 D-51309 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03
24.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 D-80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Reitzner, Bruno, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | |||
04
24.03.1993
13.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Scandex Aluminium N.V. Nijverheidsweg 9 - P.O. Box 102 NL 9600 AC Hoogezand / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Marinus J. Vereenigde Octrooibureau Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | |||
05
24.03.1993
27.04.1993
ADMISSIBLE Alcon Aluminium Consult GmbH Benrather Schlossallee 71 D 4000 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Rabus, Werner W., Dipl.-Ing. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | |||
06
22.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Giulini Chemie GmbH Postfach 15 04 80 D-67029 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
07
20.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Solvay Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 220 D-30002 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [1995/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.1992
22.10.1992
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Frankfurt Werk Knapsack Patentabteilung D-50354 Hürth / DE | ||
02
22.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Interal Vertriebs GmbH waldstr. 12 5632 Wermelskirchen / DE Opponent's representative Neumann, Joachim Postfach 10 09 45 D-51309 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03
24.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 D-80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Reitzner, Bruno, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | |||
04
24.03.1993
13.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Scandex Aluminium N.V. Nijverheidsweg 9 - P.O. Box 102 NL 9600 AC Hoogezand / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Marinus J. Vereenigde Octrooibureau Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | |||
05
24.03.1993
27.04.1993
ADMISSIBLE Alcon Aluminium Consult GmbH Benrather Schlossallee 71 D 4000 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Rabus, Werner W., Dipl.-Ing. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | |||
06
22.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Giulini Chemie GmbH Postfach 15 04 80 D-67029 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
07
20.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Solvay Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 220 D-30002 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [1995/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.1992
22.10.1992
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Frankfurt Werk Knapsack Patentabteilung D-50354 Hürth / DE | ||
02
22.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Interal Vertriebs GmbH waldstr. 12 5632 Wermelskirchen / DE Opponent's representative Neumann, Joachim Dönhoffstrasse 32 Postfach 10 09 45 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | |||
03
24.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 D-80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Reitzner, Bruno, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | |||
04
24.03.1993
13.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Scandex Aluminium N.V. Nijverheidsweg 9 - P.O. Box 102 NL 9600 AC Hoogezand / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Marinus J. Vereenigde Octrooibureau Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | |||
05
24.03.1993
27.04.1993
ADMISSIBLE Alcon Aluminium Consult GmbH Benrather Schlossallee 71 D 4000 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Rabus, Werner W., Dipl.-Ing. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | |||
06
22.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Giulini Chemie GmbH Postfach 15 04 80 D-67029 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
07
20.03.1993
04.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Solvay Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 220 D-30002 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [1993/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.1992
22.10.1992
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Frankfurt Werk Knapsack Patentabteilung D-50354 Hürth / DE | ||
02
22.03.1993
Interal Vertriebs GmbH waldstr. 12 5632 Wermelskirchen / DE Opponent's representative Neumann, Joachim Dönhoffstrasse 32 Postfach 10 09 45 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | |||
03
24.03.1993
SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 D-80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Reitzner, Bruno, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | |||
04
24.03.1993
Scandex Aluminium N.V. Nijverheidsweg 9 - P.O. Box 102 NL 9600 AC Hoogezand / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Marinus J. Vereenigde Octrooibureau Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | |||
05
24.03.1993
27.04.1993
ADMISSIBLE Alcon Aluminium Consult GmbH Benrather Schlossallee 71 D 4000 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Rabus, Werner W., Dipl.-Ing. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | |||
06
22.03.1993
Giulini Chemie GmbH Postfach 15 04 80 D-67029 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
07
20.03.1993
Solvay Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 220 D-30002 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [1993/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.1992
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Frankfurt Werk Knapsack Patentabteilung D-50354 Hürth / DE | ||
03
24.03.1993
ADMISSIBLE SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 D-80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Reitzner, Bruno, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | |||
04
24.03.1993
ADMISSIBLE Scandex Aluminium N.V. Nijverheidsweg 9 - P.O. Box 102 NL 9600 AC Hoogezand / NL Opponent's representative Hatzmann, Marinus J. Vereenigde Octrooibureau Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | |||
05
24.03.1993
ADMISSIBLE Alcon Aluminium Consult GmbH Benrather Schlossallee 71 D 4000 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Rabus, Werner W., Dipl.-Ing. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | |||
06
22.03.1993
Giulini Chemie GmbH Postfach 15 04 80 D-67029 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
07
20.03.1993
ADMISSIBLE Solvay Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 220 D-30002 Hannover / DE | |||
Former [1992/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Frankfurt Werk Knapsack Patentabteilung D-50354 Hürth / DE | 19.10.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.04.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.06.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.11.1998 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/01] | Appeal following opposition | 07.09.1995 | Appeal received No. T0748/95 | 13.11.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.06.1998 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1998/26] | 03.07.1998 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1998/27] | 22.10.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.04.1990 | DK   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.02.1998 | GB | 06.02.1998 | LU | 06.02.1998 | ES | 07.02.1998 | SE | 07.02.1998 | BE | 28.02.1998 | CH | 28.02.1998 | LI | 28.02.1998 | GR | 31.08.1998 | NL | 01.09.1998 | [2005/24] |
Former [2004/50] | AT | 06.02.1998 | |
GB | 06.02.1998 | ||
LU | 06.02.1998 | ||
ES | 07.02.1998 | ||
SE | 07.02.1998 | ||
BE | 28.02.1998 | ||
CH | 28.02.1998 | ||
LI | 28.02.1998 | ||
NL | 01.09.1998 | ||
GR | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2004/38] | AT | 06.02.1998 | |
GB | 06.02.1998 | ||
LU | 06.02.1998 | ||
ES | 07.02.1998 | ||
SE | 07.02.1998 | ||
BE | 28.02.1998 | ||
CH | 28.02.1998 | ||
LI | 28.02.1998 | ||
NL | 01.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/17] | AT | 06.02.1998 | |
GB | 06.02.1998 | ||
SE | 07.02.1998 | ||
BE | 28.02.1998 | ||
CH | 28.02.1998 | ||
LI | 28.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
NL | 01.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 06.02.1998 | |
GB | 06.02.1998 | ||
SE | 07.02.1998 | ||
BE | 28.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
NL | 01.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 06.02.1998 | |
GB | 06.02.1998 | ||
SE | 07.02.1998 | ||
BE | 28.02.1998 | ||
NL | 01.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | AT | 06.02.1998 | |
GB | 06.02.1998 | ||
SE | 07.02.1998 | ||
NL | 01.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 06.02.1998 | |
SE | 07.02.1998 | ||
NL | 01.09.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | SE | 07.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3656889 (OLEWINSKI EDWARD W); | [Y]DE2318653 (ALUMINIUM WALZWERKE SINGEN); | [Y]DE2443889 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD); | [A]DE3709950 (LINDE AG [DE]) | [ ] - R. HELMER et al.: "Weitergehende Abwasserreinigung", Deutscher Fachschriften-Verlag, Braun & Co. K.G., Mainz - Wiesbaden, DE | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 98, Nr. 22, 30. Mai 1983, Seite 332, Zusammenfassung Nr. 184968z, Columbus, Ohio, US; D. COUILLARD: "Phosphate removal form water using wastes arising from aluminum-reducing industries", & EAU QUE. 1983, 16(1), 34-7 |