EP0383189 - Device for separating blasting dust from blasting agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.10.1994 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STERN, Leif Einar Fattershus S-225 90 Lund / SE | For all designated states DRENNOW, Sten Gunnar Pilegarden S-240 17 Södra Sandby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states STERN, Leif Einar Fattershus S-225 90 Lund / SE | ||
For all designated states Drennow, Sten Gunnar Pilegarden S-240 17 Södra Sandby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. c/o Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 90102448.9 | 08.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | SE19890000528 | 16.02.1989 Original published format: SE 8900528 | [1990/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0383189 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B24C9/00, B07B7/02 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
B07B4/02 (EP,US);
B07B7/02 (EP,US);
B24C9/006 (EP,US);
Y02P70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/34] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Trennen von Staub von Strahlmittel | [1990/34] | English: | Device for separating blasting dust from blasting agent | [1990/34] | French: | Dispositif pour séparer de la poussière de granules dans un dispositif de nettoyage abrasif | [1990/34] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/48] | 10.07.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/48] | 04.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP52154195 ; | [X]GB764171 (WILLIAM HOWARD MEAD); | [X]GB1419474 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO); | [A]DE813203 (SITZMOEBEL U HOLZVERARBEITUNGS); | [A]BE568869 ; | [A]US3425250 (FARRIS LOUIS A JR, et al); | [A]US2866547 (GLADFELTER WILTIE I, et al); | [AD]CH380056 (WHEELABRATOR CORP [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 39 (M-012), 15th March 1978, page 8083 M 77; & JP-A-52 154 195 (HITACHI ZOSEN K.K.) 21-12-1977, & JP52154195 A 00000000 |