EP0440867 - Ultrasonic flow measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.09.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgärtner, Manfred, Dr.-Ing Jakob-Henle-Strasse 26 D-8510 Fürth / DE | [1991/33] | Application number, filing date | 90102591.6 | 09.02.1990 | [1991/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440867 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
G01F1/662 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, GB, LI, NL [1991/42] |
Former [1991/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Ultraschall-Durchflussmessrohr | [1991/33] | English: | Ultrasonic flow measuring device | [1991/33] | French: | Dispositif à ultrasons pour la mesure du débit d'un fluide dans un conduit | [1991/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, ES, FR, GR, IT, SE | 11.06.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/46] | 02.07.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.03.1991 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1991 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1991 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1991 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1991 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1991 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58162815 ; | [YD]EP0303255 ; | [Y]US4103551 ; | [A]DE8900110U ; | [A]FR2385084 ; | [A]US4555951 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 290 (P-245)(1435) 24 Dezember 1983, & JP-A-58 162815 (HONDA GIKEN KOGYO K.K.) 27 September 1983,, & JP58162815 A 19830927 |