EP0441990 - Method for putting reels into chaotic interim storage and device for storing and clearing out for this [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bartholomy & Co. Münsterweg 24 D-52355 Düren / DE | [1991/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Adolf Münsterweg 24 D-5160 Düren / DE | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Fichtestrasse 18 D-41464 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 90102616.1 | 10.02.1990 | [1991/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0441990 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0441990 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B66C13/48 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
B66C13/48 (EP);
B66C1/0212 (EP);
B66C1/0293 (EP);
B66C1/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum chaotischen Zwischenlagern von Wickelkörpern sowie Ein- und Auslagerungsvorrichtung hierfür | [1991/34] | English: | Method for putting reels into chaotic interim storage and device for storing and clearing out for this | [1991/34] | French: | Procédé pour le stockage provisoire chaotique des bobines et dispositif d'emmagasinage et de sortie pour ceux-ci | [1991/34] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 29.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 08.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Request for further processing for: | 15.09.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.1992 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 19.12.1992 | Date of receipt | 18.02.1993 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.1992 | 01.03.1994 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.03.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1531206 (H HUETTER JUN FA); | [AD]US3831992 (FRANCOIS D); | [A]US3973679 (HASS WINFIELD M, et al); | [A]DE3739234 (KONE ELEVATOR GMBH [CH]) | [A] - SIEMENS ZEITSCHRIFT | [A] - DEUTSCHE HEBE- UND FOERDERTECHNIK | Examination | - SIEMENS ZEITSCHRIFT, Band 51, Heft 3, 1977, Seiten 169-173, Erlangen, DE; R. GEISLER et al.: "Einsatz von Prozessrechnern bei der Automatisierung eines Containermaterials" Seite 170, rechte Spalte, Zeilen 36, 37. | - DEUTSCHE HEBE- UND FOERDERTECHNIK, Band 12, 1972, Seiten 33-38, Ludwigsburg, DE; G. BRUENNINGHAUS "Automatisierter Transport in einer Verzinkerei" Seite 34, Zeile 3-5; Figur 2. | - Sonderdruck aus dem "Wochenblatt für Papierfabrikation" 113, 1985, Nr. 14,8. 523 bis 525: Computergesteuertes Lagersystem Wöhr mit integriertem Bartholomy-Vakuum-Heber |