EP0385157 - Substrate holders to support glass lenses for coating, and domed substrate carrier to support the holders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.06.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BALZERS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 9496 Balzers / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states BALZERS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FL-9496 Balzers / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marent, Andreas Alte Landstrasse 58 A-6700 Bludenz / AT | 02 /
Kündig, Max Salätschis 624 CH-7214 Grüsch / CH | 03 /
Clinckemaillie, Alex Am Sunnaberg 554 FL-9495 Triesen / LI | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Troesch, Hans Alfred, et al Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Siewerdtstrasse 95 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | Troesch, Hans Alfred, Dr. sc. techn., et al Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Siewerdtstrasse 95 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 90102620.3 | 10.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | CH19890000753 | 01.03.1989 Original published format: CH 75389 | [1990/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0385157 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/50 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
C23C14/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/36] | Title | German: | Substrathalter zur Aufnahme von zu beschichtenden Gläsern und kalottenförmiger Substratträger zur Aufnahme von Substrathaltern | [1990/36] | English: | Substrate holders to support glass lenses for coating, and domed substrate carrier to support the holders | [1990/36] | French: | Porte-substrats pour entretenir des verres à revêtir et calotte pour entretenir les porte-substrats | [1990/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 23.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/33] | 29.03.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2159541 |