EP0383233 - Ultrasonic probe and acoustic lens attachment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunii, Yutaka, c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Kikuti, Yusiti, c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/34] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90102713.6 | 12.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | JP19890034401 | 14.02.1989 Original published format: JP 3440189 | [1990/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0383233 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0383233 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383233 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/30 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
G10K11/30 (EP,US);
B06B1/067 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/34] | B06B1/06, G10K11/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1990/34] | Title | German: | Ultraschallsonde und Befestigung einer akustischen Linse | [1990/34] | English: | Ultrasonic probe and acoustic lens attachment | [1990/34] | French: | Sonde ultrasonique et fixation d'une lentille acoustique | [1990/34] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/34] | 22.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4387720 (MILLER DAVID G); | [A]DE8526889U ; | [A]US4787070 (SUZUKI AKIFUMI [JP], et al) |