EP0384410 - Antimicrobial composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 2-3, Nihonbashi Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1990/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuda, Kouji, c/o BANYU PHARM. CO., LTD. OKAZAKI RES. LABORATORY, 9-1, Kamimutsuna 3-chome Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Sanada, Minoru, c/o BANYU PHARM. CO., LTD. OKAZAKI RES. LABORATORY, 9-1, Kamimutsuna 3-chome Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Nakagawa, Susumu, c/o BANYU PHARM. CO., LTD. OKAZAKI RES. LABORATORY, 9-1, Kamimutsuna 3-chome Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Nobuo, c/o BANYU PHARM. CO., LTD. 2-3, Nihonbashi Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Inoue, Matsuhisa 3076-3, Oaza-Tokisawa Fujimi-mura, Seta-gun, Gunma / JP | [1990/35] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90103266.4 | 20.02.1990 | [1990/35] | Priority number, date | JP19890041286 | 21.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4128689 | JP19890094460 | 14.04.1989 Original published format: JP 9446089 | [1990/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0384410 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0384410 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/545, A61K31/43, // (A61K31/545, 31:43) | [1995/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/43 (EP);
A61K31/545 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/43, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/43, A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K31/545, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/545, A61K31/40 (EP) |
Former IPC [1990/35] | A61K31/545, A61K31/43, // (A61K31/545, 31:40),(A61K31/43, 31:40) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/35] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung gegen Mikroben | [1990/35] | English: | Antimicrobial composition | [1990/35] | French: | Composition anti-microbienne | [1990/35] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 03.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 17.05.1995 | FR | 17.05.1995 | IT | 17.05.1995 | LI | 17.05.1995 | NL | 17.05.1995 | DE | 18.08.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | CH | 17.05.1995 | |
IT | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
NL | 17.05.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 17.05.1995 | |
IT | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
Former [1997/14] | CH | 17.05.1995 | |
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/16] | CH | 17.05.1995 | |
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
FR | 13.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | CH | 17.05.1995 | |
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 17.05.1995 | |
LI | 17.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0248361 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]) | Examination | - UNLISTED DRUGS, vol. 37, no. 2, February 1985, Chatham, New Jersey, US; "Zienam 250". | by applicant | JPS60126230 | JPS6137248B | JPS6250448B | JPS6326732B | JPS6160816B | JPS6010488 | JPS5951286 |