EP0385264 - Streptenols from streptomycetes, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1993 | Change - withdrawal | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeeck, Axel, Prof. Dr. Brüder-Grimm-Allee 22 D-3400 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
Grabley, Susanne, Dr. Hölderlinstrasse 7 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Wink, Joachim, Dr. Bieberer Strasse 133 D-6050 Offenbach / DE | 04 /
Hammann, Peter, Dr. Mörikestrasse 6 D-6233 Kelkheim(Taunus) / DE | 05 /
Giani, Carlo, Dr. Hedderichstrasse 69 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 70 / DE | 06 /
Kricke-Helling, Pia, Dr. Welfenweg 1 D-3406 Bovenden / DE | [1990/36] | Application number, filing date | 90103411.6 | 22.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | DE19893905930 | 25.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3905930 | [1990/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0385264 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0385264 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C33/025, C07C33/02, C07C49/24, C12P7/18, C12P7/26, C12N1/20, C12N9/99, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:465) | [1990/36] | CPC: |
C07C33/02 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C33/025 (EP,US);
C12P7/18 (EP,US);
C12P7/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/36] | Title | German: | Neue Streptenole aus Streptomyceten, ihre Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1990/36] | English: | Streptenols from streptomycetes, their preparation and use | [1990/36] | French: | Strepténols à partir de streptomycètes, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1990/36] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PHYTOCHEMISTRY, Band 27, Nr. 11, 1989, Seiten 3611-3617, Pergamon Press, GB; A. ARNONE et al.: "A new strain of Streptomyces: an anthracycline containing a C-glucoside moiety and a chiral decanol" |