Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.1992 [1992/26] |
14.05.1991 | Change - classification | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] |
13.03.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] |
21.07.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] |