EP0385268 - Tube for conducting medical fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.1992 [1992/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius AG Gluckensteinweg 5 61350 Bad Homburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states Fresenius AG Gluckensteinweg 5 D-61350 Bad Homburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krick, Gerd, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Kaiser-Friedrich-Promenade 92 D-6380 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 90103437.1 | 22.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | DE19893906027 | 27.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3906027 | [1990/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0385268 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0385268 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, F16L11/115 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
A61M39/08 (EP);
F16L11/111 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/36] | A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/36] | Title | German: | Schlauch zur Führung von medizinischen Flüssigkeiten | [1990/36] | English: | Tube for conducting medical fluids | [1990/36] | French: | Tube pour conduire des liquides médicaux | [1990/36] | File destroyed: | 22.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/26] | 31.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.12.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2333488 ; | [YD]DE2946385 ; | [X]US3858615 ; | [AD]DE3239475 |