EP0384461 - Upright assembly for fork lift truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohta, Shuji, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Toshiyuki, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1990/35] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/35] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90103450.4 | 22.02.1990 | [1990/35] | Priority number, date | JP19890044294 | 23.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4429489 | JP19890044295 | 23.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4429589 | [1990/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0384461 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0384461 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0384461 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/08 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
B66F9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/35] | Title | German: | Hubmast für Gabelstapler | [1990/35] | English: | Upright assembly for fork lift truck | [1990/35] | French: | Mât pour chariot-élévateur | [1990/35] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2166508 (NISSAN SHATAI CO); | [A]DE2049952 ; | [A]US3951471 (LANGENSTEIN JOSEPH G); | [A]US3208556 (SHAFFER WALTER M) |