EP0394638 - Method of etching polyimides and resulting passivation structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kindl, Thomas E. 2009 Kim Drive Endwell N.Y. 13760 / US | 02 /
Rickerl, Paul G. R.D. No. 6 Box 184D, Tilbury Hill Road Endicott, N.Y. 13760 / US | 03 /
Russel, David J. 97B Little Hill Road Apalachin, N.Y. 13732 / US | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Rach, Werner, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Rach, Werner, Dr., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/37] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/22] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1990/44] | Kreidler, Eva-Maria, Dr. rer. nat. IBM Deutschland GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-71032 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90103546.9 | 23.02.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | US19890343217 | 26.04.1989 Original published format: US 343217 | [1990/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0394638 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0394638 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394638 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/40 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
H01L21/31133 (EP,US);
H05K3/002 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0154 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0166 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0793 (EP,US);
H05K3/108 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/44] | H01L21/311, H01L21/312, G03F7/038 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/44] | Title | German: | Methode zum Ätzen von Polyimiden und resultierenden passivierten Strukturen | [1990/44] | English: | Method of etching polyimides and resulting passivation structures | [1990/44] | French: | Méthode pour attaquer des polyimides et structures passivées en résultant | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 12.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   09.04.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.07.1997 | DE | 18.02.1998 | GB | 23.02.1998 | [2002/32] |
Former [1999/02] | DE | 18.02.1998 | |
GB | 23.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DE | 18.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63122224 ; | [A]US4436583 (SAIKI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 15, no. 9, February 1973, NEW YORK US page 2820; M.A. LOUKIANOFF: 'Etchant and Solvent for Cured Polyimides' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 369 (E-665)4 October 1988 & JP-A-63 122 224 ( NEC CORP. ) 26 May 1988, & JP63122224 A 19880526 |