Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4943368 | 24.07.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US27160888 | 15.11.1988 | US31608589 | 27.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0385310 | Global Dossier | 02.02.1994 | B1 | EP0385310 | 05.09.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31608589 | 27.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2010187 | 03.05.1994 | C | CA2010187 | 27.08.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31608589 | 27.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69006374T | 19.05.1994 | T2 | DE69006374D1 | 17.03.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US31608589 | 27.02.1989 |