EP0385310 - Electrostatic waste separation process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PITTSBURGH MINERAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGY, INC. 390 Frankfort Road Monaca Pennsylvania 15061 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states PITTSBURGH MINERAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGY, INC. 390 Frankfort Road Monaca, Pennsylvania 15061 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilbert, Stanley Rice 1780 Hassam Road Coraopolis, Pennsylvania 15108 / US | 02 /
Weyand, Thomas Edward 1158 Third Street Beaver, Pennsylvania 15009 / US | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/36] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90103575.8 | 23.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | US19890316085 | 27.02.1989 Original published format: US 316085 | [1990/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0385310 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0385310 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B09B5/00, B07B1/00, B07B4/00, B03B7/00, B03B9/06, B03C1/00, B03C3/00, B03C7/00 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
B07B9/00 (EP,US);
B03B9/061 (EP,US);
B24C9/006 (EP,US);
Y02P70/10 (EP,US);
Y02W30/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, NL, SE [1990/36] | Title | German: | Elektrostatisches Abfall-Trennverfahren | [1990/36] | English: | Electrostatic waste separation process | [1990/36] | French: | Procédé électrostatique de séparation de déchets | [1990/36] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 12.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 30.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Request for further processing for: | 30.11.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 02.02.1994 | SE | 02.02.1994 | [1998/15] |
Former [1994/45] | SE | 02.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0278328 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0312174 (HYDRACONSULT BV [NL]); | [A]DE3146049 (SUISMAN & BLUMENTHAL INC [US]); | [A]EP0307250 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]); | [A]US4343694 (COOK JERRY A, et al); | [A]US4750993 (DONHAUSER FRIEDRICH [DE], et al) |