EP0386556 - Process for producing a metallic composite body having a region of high wear resistance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fried. Krupp AG Altendorfer Strasse 103 45143 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | For all designated states Fried. Krupp AG Altendorfer Strasse 103 D-45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states Fried. Krupp Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Altendorfer Strasse 103 D-45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bremekamp, Hansgeorg, Dipl.-Ing. Schillerstrasse 16 D-4133 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | 02 /
Dahlmann, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Am Hagenbusch 17 D-4300 Essen 15 / DE | 03 /
Jachowski, Johannes Düsseldorfer Strasse 152 D D-4100 Duisburg 46 / DE | 04 /
Mulisch, Erich, Dipl.-Ing. Böllerts Höfe 5 D-4330 Mülheim / DE | 05 /
Pant, Paul, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrichstrasse 21 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | [1990/37] | Application number, filing date | 90103614.5 | 24.02.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | DE19893907021 | 04.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3907021 | [1990/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0386556 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0386556 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B22D23/10 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
C22C1/1036 (EP);
B22D23/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung metallischer, hochverschleissbeständige Bereiche aufweisender Verbundkörper | [1990/37] | English: | Process for producing a metallic composite body having a region of high wear resistance | [1990/37] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'un composite métallique qui a une région présentant une résistance élevée à l'usure | [1990/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.08.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61113737 ; | [A]JP5495902 ; | [AD]EP0164002 ; | [A]FR2096585 | [A] - VID-BERICHTE, Nr. 670, 1988, Seiten 323-336, Essen, DE; P. PANT et al.: "Neuartige Bauteile für den Einsatz bei extremen Verschleissbeanspruchungen" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 296 (C-377)[2352], 8. Oktober 1986; & JP-A-61 113 737 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.) 31-05-1986, & JP61113737 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 3, Nr. 114 (C-59), 21. September 1979, Seite 150 C 59; & JP-A-54 95 902 (HITACHI ZOSEN K.K.) 28-07-1979, & JP5495902 A 00000000 |