EP0388687 - Method of exchanging data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datawatt BV Houtstraat 5 NL-8471 ZX Wolvega / NL | [1991/38] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Walter, Dr. Winzerstrasse 40 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | 02 /
Hagmann, Walter, Dr. Bachstrasse 92a CH-5034 Suhr / CH | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Ottow, Jens M., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Ottow, Jens M., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1993/38] | Ottow, Jens M., Dr., et al Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 CH-8045 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1991/38] | Ottow, Jens M. Asea Brown Boveri AG Abteilung REI-Immaterialgüterrecht CH-5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 90104090.7 | 02.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | CH19890001047 | 21.03.1989 Original published format: CH 104789 | [1990/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0388687 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388687 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04B3/54 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
H04L12/417 (EP,US);
H04B3/54 (EP,US);
H04L12/403 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5445 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Austauschen von Daten | [1990/39] | English: | Method of exchanging data | [1990/39] | French: | Méthode pour échanger des données | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 15.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.05.1995 | DK | 31.05.1995 | ES | 31.05.1995 | GR | 31.05.1995 | IT | 31.05.1995 | NL | 31.05.1995 | SE | 31.08.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
DK | 31.05.1995 | ||
ES | 31.05.1995 | ||
GR | 31.05.1995 | ||
IT | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
DK | 31.05.1995 | ||
GR | 31.05.1995 | ||
IT | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
DK | 31.05.1995 | ||
IT | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
DK | 31.05.1995 | ||
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1997/17] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
SE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 31.05.1995 | |
SE | 31.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0100668 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]GB2176972 (ROBINTON PROD INC); | [AD]EP0231457 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) | [A] - GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE 1987,15.-18.November 1987,Tokyo,JP IEEE(New York,US) Seiten 1415 - 1421; S.T. VUONG et al.: "DESIGN AND IMPLEMENTATION OF THE ACCESS AND LINK PROTOCOLS FOR A LOW-COSTLAN USING ELECTRIC POWER LINES" | [A] - 1985 NATIONAL AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE,20.-24.Mai 1985 IEEE(New York,US) Seiten 130 - 135; H.J. ALBER et al.: "A DUAL CHANNEL HIGH SPEED FIBER OPTICS MULTIPLEX DATA BUS SYSTEM" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 24, no. 9, Februar 1982, NEW YORK US Seiten 4828 - 4831; C.D. GRAVATTE et al.: "CHANNEL ACCESS VIA MULTIPLE LEVEL POLLING" |