EP0386663 - Method of preparing styrene foams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.1991 [1991/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U.C. INDUSTRIES, INC. 2 Sylvan Way Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states U.C. INDUSTRIES, INC. 2 Sylvan Way Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breindel, Raymond M. 11383 Sagebrush Avenue Uniontown, Ohio 44685 / US | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104158.2 | 03.03.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | US19890319550 | 06.03.1989 Original published format: US 319550 | [1990/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0386663 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/14, C08L101/00, B29C67/22 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
B29C44/3407 (EP,KR);
B29C48/0012 (KR);
B29C44/50 (EP,KR);
C08J9/0061 (EP,KR);
C08J9/122 (KR);
C08J9/143 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Styrolschaumstoffen | [1990/37] | English: | Method of preparing styrene foams | [1990/37] | French: | Procédé pour préparer des mousses de styrène | [1990/37] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/46] | 14.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1143558 ; | [YD]US4199310 (PHIPPS ARTHUR L [US]); | [YD]US4234529 (PHIPPS ARTHUR L); | [YD]US4364722 (PHIPPS ARTHUR L); | [X]EP0124958 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) |