EP0400281 - Device for continuously jacketing cylindrical workpieces with elastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERMANN BERSTORFF Maschinenbau GmbH Hannoversche Strasse 149 D-30627 Hannover (Kleefeld) / DE | [1990/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller-Erwig, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. Osterberg 8 D-3057 Neustadt 2 / DE | [1990/49] | Application number, filing date | 90104383.6 | 08.03.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | DE19893917372 | 29.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3917372 | [1990/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400281 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400281 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400281 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/02 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
B29C48/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/15 (EP,US);
B29C48/32 (EP,US);
B29C48/34 (EP,US);
B29C48/395 (EP,US);
B29C48/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/49] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum kontinuierlichen Ummanteln von zylindrischen Werkstücken mit einem elastischen Material | [1990/49] | English: | Device for continuously jacketing cylindrical workpieces with elastic material | [1990/49] | French: | Dispositif pour enrober de façon continuelle des pièces à usiner cylindriques avec un matériau élastique | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB921414 (ALF MILO ANDERSEN); | [Y]GB1082538 (NAOTARO OKAZAKI); | [YD]EP0231976 (VIRADAN AS [DK]) |