Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE36103E | 16.02.1999 | E | Priority number | Date | DE3907964 | 11.03.1989 | US49083390 | 08.03.1990 | US27850494 | 21.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU641638B | Global Dossier | 30.09.1993 | B2 | AU5117990 | 13.09.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3907964 | 11.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0387691 | Global Dossier | 28.06.1995 | B1 | EP0387691 | 19.09.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3907964 | 11.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2011880 | 11.09.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3907964 | 11.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3907964 | 13.09.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3907964 | 11.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59009311D1 | 03.08.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3907964 | 11.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2076240T | 01.11.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE3907964 | 11.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3176609B | 18.06.2001 | B2 | JPH02274704 | 08.11.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3907964 | 11.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5132381 | 21.07.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3907964 | 11.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA901845 | 28.11.1990 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3907964 | 11.03.1989 |