EP0387691 - Process for preparing a syndiotactic polyolefin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winter, Andreas, Dr. Gundelhardtstrasse 2 D-6233 Kelkheim/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Rohrmann, Jürgen, Dr. Die Ritterwiesen 10 D-6237 Liederbach / DE | 03 /
Antberg, Martin, Dr. Sachsenring 10 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 04 /
Dolle, Volker, Dr. Hattersheimer Strasse 15 D-6233 Kelkheim/Taunus / DE | 05 /
Spaleck, Walter, Dr. Sulzbacher Strasse 63 D-6237 Liederbach / DE | [1990/38] | Application number, filing date | 90104402.4 | 08.03.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | DE19893907964 | 11.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3907964 | [1990/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0387691 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387691 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/642 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/01, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/05, C08F2500/16, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines syndiotaktischen Polyolefins | [1990/38] | English: | Process for preparing a syndiotactic polyolefin | [1990/38] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une polyoléfine syndiotactique | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 19.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 18.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0351392 (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US]) | [XD] - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., Band 110, 1988, Seiten 6255-6256, American Chemical Society; J.A. EWEN et al.: "Syndiospecific propylene polymerizations with group 4 metallocenes" |