EP0387693 - Transdermal system with stepwise drug release, and its use in local or systemic cosmetic administration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/38] | Transdermal system with stepwise medicament release, and its use in local or systemic medicament administration | ||
[1996/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme GmbH Irlicher Strasse 55 56567 Neuwied / DE | [1996/38] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE-SYSTEME GmbH & CO.KG Postfach 23 43 D-56513 Neuwied / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Walter, Dr.-Dipl.-Chem. Engerser Strasse 56 D-5450 Neuwied 1 / DE | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus · Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Sperlingsweg 32 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [1990/38] | Klöpsch, Gerald, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt, et al An Gross St. Martin 6 D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104406.5 | 08.03.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | DE19893908431 | 15.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3908431 | [1990/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0387693 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0387693 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387693 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP);
A61M37/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/38] | Title | German: | Transdermales System mit gestufter Wirkstoffabgabe und Verwendung für die lokale oder systemische, kosmetische Wirkstoffverabreichung | [1996/39] | English: | Transdermal system with stepwise drug release, and its use in local or systemic cosmetic administration | [1996/39] | French: | Système transdermique de libération de médicament par paliers et son utilisation pour l'administration locale ou systémique de produits cosmétiques | [1996/39] |
Former [1990/38] | Transdermales System mit gestufter Wirkstoffabgabe und Verwendung für die lokale oder systemische Wirkstoffverabreichung | ||
Former [1990/38] | Transdermal system with stepwise medicament release, and its use in local or systemic medicament administration | ||
Former [1990/38] | Système transdermique de libération de médicament par paliers et son utilisation pour l'administration locale ou systémique | Examination procedure | 06.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0113562 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE]); | [AD]EP0227252 (ALZA CORP [US]); | [A]EP0242827 (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0249343 (ALZA CORP [US]); | [A]US4781924 (LEE EUN S [US], et al) |