EP0397975 - Method of making a variable capacitor microphone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/47] | Electret and method and apparatus for making same | ||
[1995/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gentex Corporation 324 Main Street P.O. Box 315 Carbondale, Pennsylvania 18407 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states GENTEX CORPORATION 324 Main Street P.O. Box 315 Carbondale Pennsylvania 18407 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cote, Paul L. 48 Governor Dinsmore Road Windham, New Hampshire 030387 / US | 02 /
Sallavanti, Robert A. 104 Miles Street Dalton, Pennsylvania 18414 / US | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104488.3 | 09.03.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | US19890354893 | 19.05.1989 Original published format: US 354893 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0397975 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0397975 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397975 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01G7/02, H04R19/04 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
H04R19/01 (EP);
H01G7/02 (KR);
H01G7/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1990/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines variablen Kondensator- mikrophons | [1995/36] | English: | Method of making a variable capacitor microphone | [1995/36] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un microphone à condenseur variable | [1995/36] |
Former [1990/47] | Elektret-Wandler sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung desselben | ||
Former [1990/47] | Electret and method and apparatus for making same | ||
Former [1990/47] | Transducteur à électrète ainsi que procédé et appareil pour sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 27.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63216326 ; | [A]JP61219299 ; | [A]US4281072 (WETTON RAYMOND E, et al) | [X] - PROC. 5th INTERN. SYMP. ELECTRETS, Heidelberg, 1985, pages 678-683; S. CRESTANA et al.: "Electret production and dosimetry with alpha-particles". | [A] - NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGY, vol. 75, no. 2, November 1986, pages 215-221, US; T. UDA et al.: "Characteristics of a foil-type electret dosimeter for a surface alpha contamination monitor". | [X] - JAPANESE PATENTS REPORTS volume 88, no 42, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 88-296230; & JP-A-63 216 326 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) 8 September 1988, & JP63216326 A 19880908 | [A] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY vol. 80, no. 12, 1976, EASTON US pages 1387 - 1388; I.F. MILLER ET AL: 'Polyelectrolyte membrane electrets. Evidence for high degree of charge storage capacity.' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 59 (E-482)24 February 1987; & JP-A-61 219 299 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO. LTD) 29-09-1986, & JP61219299 A 19870224 |