EP0389849 - Control sytem for a spinning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/40] | Control sytem for a textile machine | ||
[1998/31] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erni, Markus Langgasse 56 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner, et al Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Canzler & Bergmeier Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [1990/40] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys.) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104538.5 | 09.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | DE19893910181 | 29.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3910181 | [1990/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0389849 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0389849 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389849 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0389849 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D01H13/14, B65H63/00, D01H13/32, G05B19/04 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
D01H13/14 (EP);
B65H63/00 (EP);
D01H13/32 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/40] | D01H13/14, B65H63/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/40] | Title | German: | Steuersystem für eine Spinnmaschine | [1998/31] | English: | Control sytem for a spinning machine | [1998/31] | French: | Système de commande pour une machine de filature | [1998/31] |
Former [1990/40] | Steuersystem für eine Textilmaschine | ||
Former [1990/40] | Control sytem for a textile machine | ||
Former [1990/40] | Système de commande pour une machine textile | Examination procedure | 04.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 17.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 25.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97120984.6 / EP0832997 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.1999
ADMISSIBLE Zinser Textilmaschinen GmbH Hans-Zinser-Strasse 73061 Ebersbach/Fils / DE Opponent's representative Schieschke, Klaus Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.1999
ADMISSIBLE Zinser Textilmaschinen GmbH Hans-Zinser-Strasse 73061 Ebersbach/Fils / DE Opponent's representative Schieschke, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | 08.06.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.09.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.11.1999 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 03.12.1999 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 19.06.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.07.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.07.2003 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.09.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.09.2000 | Appeal received No. T0939/00 | 29.11.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.07.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 02.07.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.07.2003 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.07.1998 | GB | 29.07.1998 | ES | 10.03.1999 | CH | 31.03.2002 | LI | 31.03.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/28] | GB | 29.07.1998 | |
FR | 24.12.1998 | ||
ES | 10.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2004/14] | GB | 29.07.1998 | |
FR | 24.12.1998 | ||
ES | 11.04.2000 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GB | 29.07.1998 | |
FR | 24.12.1998 | ||
CH | 31.03.2002 | ||
LI | 31.03.2002 | ||
Former [1999/30] | GB | 29.07.1998 | |
FR | 24.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 24.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58144135 ; | [AD]DE3005746 (SCRAGG & SONS [GB]); | [AD]DE2946031 (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2542767 (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]); | [AP]DE3914865 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2022870 (HAWKER SIDDELEY DYNAMICS ENG) | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON APPLICATIONS AND INDUSTRY. vol. IA-20, no. 1, Januar 1984, NEW YORK US Seiten 32 - 36; Ward A. Garrabrant: "A Hierarchical Programmable Controller System for Batch Material Handling" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 259 (C-195)(1404) 18 November 1983, & JP-A-58 144135 (MURATA KIKAI K.K) 27 August 1983,, & JP58144135 A 19830827 | [A] - TEXTIL PRAXIS INTERNATIONAL. Juli 1983, LEINFELDEN DE, Seiten 663-667; G. Mierzowsky & H. Wöhler: "Prozessunterstützung durch EDV in Spinnerei, Weberei und Veredelung" | [A] - MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL. vol. 12, no. 7, Juli 1979, LONDON GB, Seiten 281 - 290; J.H.Edgington: "Controls in the glass industry and future automation:Part1" | Examination | - MARCEL ZÜND, "Mikroelektronik-heutige und zukünftige Einsatzgebiete in Spinnereibetrieben", MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, DE, (1985), vol. 66, no. 6, pages 401 - 407 | Opposition | - ZINZER NOVUM, TECHNOLOGIE IN GARN 6, ZINZER TEXTIELMASCHINEN GmbH, 1988 | - ZINZER NOVUM, TECHNOLOGIE IN GARN 8, ZINZER TEXTIELMASCHINEN GmbH, 1988 | - Betriebsanleitung Fil-A-Guard/Roving-Guard, Zinzer Textielmaschinen GmbH, 25-02-88 |