EP0392194 - Spinning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.1993 [1993/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF Textilmaschinen-Komponenten GmbH Löwentorstrasse 68 D-70376 Stuttgart / DE | [1990/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pasch, Christoph, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) In den Ringelgärten 8 D-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Patentanwälte Bartels, Held und Partner Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104607.8 | 12.03.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | DE19893912489 | 15.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3912489 | DE19893919687 | 16.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3919687 | [1990/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0392194 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D01H1/34 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
D01H1/34 (EP);
D01H5/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, IT, LI [1990/42] | Title | German: | Spinnmachine | [1990/42] | English: | Spinning machine | [1990/42] | French: | Métier à filer | [1990/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 10.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/43] | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2621605 ; | [A]EP0260206 ; | [A]DE2753924 |