EP0406523 - Fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSAKA GAS CO., LTD. 1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states OSAKA GAS CO., LTD. 1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akagi, Kousuke, c/o Osaka Gas, Co. Ltd. 1-ban, 2-go, 4-chome Hirano-machi, Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Postfach 40 26 D-76025 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104608.6 | 12.03.1990 | [1991/02] | Priority number, date | JP19890176569 | 07.07.1989 Original published format: JP 17656989 | JP19890231912 | 06.09.1989 Original published format: JP 23191289 | [1991/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0406523 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/24, H01M8/02, H01M8/12 | [1991/02] | CPC: |
H01M8/0228 (EP,US);
H01M8/0232 (EP,US);
H01M8/0234 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (EP,US);
H01M8/0263 (EP,US);
H01M8/0267 (EP,US);
H01M8/0276 (US);
H01M8/04067 (EP,US);
H01M8/241 (US);
H01M8/2432 (EP);
H01M8/2483 (US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1991/02] | Title | German: | Brennstoffzelle | [1991/02] | English: | Fuel cell | [1991/02] | French: | Pile à combustible | [1991/02] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/15] | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5996668 ; | [Y]JP63102171 ; | [A]JP58123672 ; | [XP]JP01313855 ; | [XP]JP01197972 ; | [EL]JP02103863 ; | [A]JP61109262 ; | [X]FR2296703 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [XP]EP0357025 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]); | [A]EP0320087 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]FR1399157 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]US3300344 (BRAY DONALD T, et al); | [A]US3394032 (GEORGES DANNER) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 209 (E-268)[1646], 22nd September 1984; & JP-A-59 96 668 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN) 04-06-1984, & JP5996668 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 337 (E-657)[3184], 12th September 1988; & JP-A-63 102 171 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO.) 07-05-1988, & JP63102171 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 233 (E-204)[1378], 15th October 1983; & JP-A-58 123 672 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 22-07-1983, & JP58123672 A 00000000 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 14, no. 117 (E-898)[4060], 5th March 1990; & JP-A-01 313 855 (NKK CORP.) 19-12-1989, & JP01313855 A 00000000 | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 112, no. 14, 2nd April 1990, page 207, abstract no. 122234f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-01 197 972 (AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGY) 09-08-1989, & JP01197972 A 00000000 | [EL] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 14, no. 316 (E-949)[4259], 6th July 1990; & JP-A-02 103 863 (OSAKA GAS) 16-04-1990, & JP02103863 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 289 (E-442)[2345], 2nd October 1986; & JP-A-61 109 262 (HITACHI LTD) 27-05-1986, & JP61109262 A 00000000 |