EP0387791 - Method and apparatus for time series signal recognition with signal variation proof learning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takebayashi, Yoichi 1660-A105 Komaoka-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kanazawa, Hiroshi 2-3-7-202 Kamiimaizumi Ebina-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Chimoto, Hiroyuki 3-7-1-507 Nakahara, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104727.4 | 13.03.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | JP19890057978 | 13.03.1989 Original published format: JP 5797889 | [1990/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0387791 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0387791 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387791 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G10L3/00, G10L5/06 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
G10L15/20 (EP,US);
G10L15/063 (EP,US);
G10L2015/0631 (EP,US);
G10L2015/0638 (EP,US);
G10L2015/088 (EP,US);
G10L21/0216 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/38] | G10L5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Erkennung von Signalzeitfolgen mit von Signalvariationen unabhängigem Lernen | [1990/38] | English: | Method and apparatus for time series signal recognition with signal variation proof learning | [1990/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la reconnaissance de suites temporelles de signaux avec apprentissage insensible aux variations du signal | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0178509 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [X]US4720802 (DAMOULAKIS JOHN N [US], et al) | [A] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING vol. 3, 19 March 1984, SAN DIEGO CALIFORNIA pages 3571 - 3574; LEE, GANESAN: 'SPEECH RECOGNITION UNDER ADDITIVE NOISE' | [A] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING vol. 2, 6 April 1987, DALLAS TEXAS pages 1139 - 1142; ROE: 'SPEECH RECOGNITION WITH A NOISE ADAPTING CODEBOOK' | [A] - SPEECH TECHNOLOGY vol. 1, no. 3, 28 April 1986, NEW YORK US pages 241 - 249; PAUL ET AL: 'ROBUST HMM BASED TECHNIQUES FOR RECOGNITION OF SPEECH PRODUCED UNDER STRESS AND IN NOISE' |