EP0388771 - Phenoxysulfonylureas based on 3-substituted salicyclic acid alkyl esters, processes for their preparation and their use as herbicides and plant growth regulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/39] | Phenoxysulfonylureas based on 3-substituted salicyclic acid alkyl esters, processes for ther preparation and their use as herbicides and plant growth regulators | ||
[1995/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoechst Schering AgrEvo GmbH Gerichtstrasse 27 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states Hoechst Schering AgrEvo GmbH Gerichtstrasse 27 D-13342 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kehne, Heinz, Dr. Berliner Strasse 10 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Willms, Lothar, Dr. Lindenstrasse 17 D-5416 Hillscheid / DE | 03 /
Bauer, Klaus, Dr. Doorner Strasse 53d D-6450 Hanau / DE | 04 /
Bieringer, Hermann, Dr. Eichenweg 26 D-6239 Eppstein/Taunus / DE | 05 /
Bürstell, Helmut, Dr. Am Hohlacker 65 D-6230 Frankfurt am Main 50 / DE | [1995/26] |
Former [1990/39] | 01 /
Kehne, Heinz Berliner Strasse 10 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | ||
02 /
Willms, Lothar, Dr. Lindenstrasse 17 D-5416 Hillscheid / DE | |||
03 /
Bauer, Klaus, Dr. Doorner Strasse 53d D-6450 Hanau / DE | |||
04 /
Bieringer, Hermann, Dr. Eichenweg 26 D-6239 Eppstein/Taunus / DE | |||
05 /
Bürstell, Helmut, Dr. Am Hohlacker 65 D-6230 Frankfurt am Main 50 / DE | Application number, filing date | 90104783.7 | 14.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | DE19893909053 | 18.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3909053 | [1990/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0388771 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388771 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/42, C07D239/52, C07D239/47, C07D239/56, C07D251/44, C07D251/46, C07D251/42, A01N47/36 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
C07D521/00 (EP);
C07D239/24 (KR);
A01N47/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/26] |
Former [1990/39] | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Phenoxysulfonylharnstoffe auf Basis von 3-substituierten Salicylsäurealkylestern, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Herbizide und Pflanzenwachstumsregulatoren | [1990/39] | English: | Phenoxysulfonylureas based on 3-substituted salicyclic acid alkyl esters, processes for their preparation and their use as herbicides and plant growth regulators | [1995/26] | French: | Phénoxysulfonylurées à base d'esters alkyl d'acide salicyclique, procédés pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme herbicides et régulateurs de croissance des plantes | [1990/39] |
Former [1990/39] | Phenoxysulfonylureas based on 3-substituted salicyclic acid alkyl esters, processes for ther preparation and their use as herbicides and plant growth regulators | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 12.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Request for further processing for: | 29.12.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 29.12.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.03.1996 | ES | 15.03.1996 | [2004/37] |
Former [1997/17] | GB | 14.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0004163 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]DE3105453 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]US4391976 (BOEHNER BEAT [CH]); | [AD]DE3151450 (CELAMERCK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]EP0098569 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0303114 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |