EP0387866 - Method and apparatus for the reproduction of magnetically stored information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.1995 [1995/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woike, Theo, Dr. Dürener Strasse 290 D-5000 Köln 41 / DE | 02 /
Kerkmann, Detlef Brockmüllerstrasse 16 D-5170 Jülich / DE | 03 /
Beier, Thomas Hospitalstrasse 34 D-5030 Hürth / DE | 04 /
Krasser, Wolfgang, Dr. An der Lünette 4c D-5170 Jülich / DE | 05 /
Pescia, Danilo, Dr. Victor-Gollancz-Strasse 55 D-5170 Jülich / DE | [1990/38] | Application number, filing date | 90104874.4 | 15.03.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | DE19893908587 | 16.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3908587 | [1990/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0387866 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0387866 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
G11B11/10543 (EP,US);
G11B11/10 (KR);
G11B11/10515 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auslesen magnetisch gespeicherter Informationen | [1990/38] | English: | Method and apparatus for the reproduction of magnetically stored information | [1990/38] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la réproduction emmagasinées par voie magnétique | [1990/38] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 06.05.1992 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 29.06.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 28.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/46] | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/46] | Request for further processing for: | 07.01.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0278406 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0292733 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0294242 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]EP0274031 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) |