Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU630173B | Global Dossier | 22.10.1992 | B2 | AU5218090 | 27.09.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0389943 | Global Dossier | 03.02.1993 | B1 | EP0389943 | 03.10.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE85478T | 15.02.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2012239 | 01.06.1999 | C | CA2012239 | 27.09.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1018415B | 23.09.1992 | B | CN1046073 | 10.10.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69000845T | 19.05.1993 | T2 | DE69000845D1 | 18.03.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0389943T | 17.05.1993 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2038458T | 16.07.1993 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3077063B | 14.08.2000 | B2 | JPH02285805 | 26.11.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0149841B | 15.12.1998 | B1 | KR900015452 | 27.10.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY105155 | 30.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4933646 | 12.06.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US32916189 | 27.03.1989 |