Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
28.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] |
23.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] |
06.08.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] |
31.03.1992 | First examination report | |
19.12.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] |
11.08.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] |