EP0388927 - Methods and apparatus for obtaining a feathered spray [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoy, Kenneth Look 839 MacQueen Blvd. St. Albans (25177), West Virginia / US | 02 /
Nielsen, Kenneth Andrew 108 Stratford Place Charleston (25303), West Virginia / US | 03 /
Bok, Hendrik Frederik 52 Thomson Street Fairhaven (02719), Massachusetts / US | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90105352.0 | 21.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | US19890327273 | 22.03.1989 Original published format: US 327273 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0388927 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388927 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/02, B05B7/02, B05D1/04, C09D7/00 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
B05B12/1418 (EP,US);
B05B1/00 (KR);
B05B7/32 (EP,US);
B05D1/025 (EP,US);
C09D7/20 (EP,US);
B05D1/04 (EP,US);
B05D2401/90 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Schwertspritzens | [1990/39] | English: | Methods and apparatus for obtaining a feathered spray | [1990/39] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour obtenir une projection du type losange | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8500993 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]); | [XP]EP0321607 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [XP]EP0350910 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [XP]EP0350909 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |