Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] |
24.03.1994 | First examination report | |
04.09.1991 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] |
04.09.1991 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] |
26.07.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] |
08.01.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] |
25.08.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.10.1990 [1990/41] |