EP0392230 - Internal axis rotary piston machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.1993 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.G. Kühnle, Kopp & Kausch Postfach 265 Hessheimer Strasse 2 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | For all designated states A.G. Kühnle, Kopp & Kausch Postfach 265 Hessheimer Strasse 2 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Münkel, Uwe Dietrich-Bonhoeffer-Strasse 40 D-6710 Frankenthal 6 / DE | 02 /
Kraft, Wolfgang Bergstrasse 18 D-6521 Offstein / DE | 03 /
Römuss, Christiane Birkenstrasse 1 D-6711 Beindersheim / DE | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Klose, Hans, et al Rechts- und Patentanwälte, Reble & Klose, Bereich Patente & Marken, Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/42] | Klose, Hans, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Klose & Schmitt, Kurfürstenstrasse 32 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90105479.1 | 23.03.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | DE19893911540 | 08.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3911540 | [1990/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0392230 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0392230 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392230 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F01C21/00, F01C1/10 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
F01C21/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/42] | Title | German: | Innenachsige Drehkolbenmaschine | [1990/42] | English: | Internal axis rotary piston machine | [1990/42] | French: | Machine à piston rotatif à axe interne | [1990/42] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 31.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.12.1992 | FR | 16.12.1992 | GB | 16.12.1992 | IT | 16.12.1992 | NL | 16.12.1992 | SE | 16.12.1992 | AT | 23.03.1993 | CH | 31.03.1993 | LI | 31.03.1993 | LU | 31.03.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/06] | BE | 16.12.1992 | |
GB | 16.12.1992 | ||
IT | 16.12.1992 | ||
NL | 16.12.1992 | ||
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
AT | 23.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
LU | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 14.05.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 16.12.1992 | |
GB | 16.12.1992 | ||
IT | 16.12.1992 | ||
NL | 16.12.1992 | ||
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
AT | 23.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 14.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/46] | BE | 16.12.1992 | |
GB | 16.12.1992 | ||
NL | 16.12.1992 | ||
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
AT | 23.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 14.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | BE | 16.12.1992 | |
GB | 16.12.1992 | ||
NL | 16.12.1992 | ||
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 14.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/49] | BE | 16.12.1992 | |
GB | 16.12.1992 | ||
NL | 16.12.1992 | ||
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
FR | 14.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/48] | BE | 16.12.1992 | |
GB | 16.12.1992 | ||
NL | 16.12.1992 | ||
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/38] | BE | 16.12.1992 | |
NL | 16.12.1992 | ||
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | NL | 16.12.1992 | |
SE | 16.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | NL | 16.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0249178 (WANKEL FELIX); | [A]DE3709901 (WANKEL FELIX [DE]); | [AD]EP0290864 (KUEHNLE KOPP KAUSCH AG [DE]) |