blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0391167

EP0391167 - Transferable room air conditioner of split type [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.12.1991
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.1991Change - withdrawalpublished on 29.01.1992 [1992/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bigarella, Armando
Via Carlo Cattaneo 13
I-20052 Monza (Milan) / IT
[1990/41]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1990/41]
Representative(s)Giambrocono, Alfonso, et al
Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1990/41]Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al
Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B
I-20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date90105508.723.03.1990
[1990/41]
Priority number, dateIT1989002002305.04.1989         Original published format: IT 2002389
[1990/41]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0391167
Date:10.10.1990
Language:EN
[1990/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0391167
Date:09.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.1991
ClassificationIPC:F24F1/02
[1990/41]
CPC:
F24F1/14 (EP); F24F1/0003 (EP); F24F1/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [1990/41]
TitleGerman:Transportierbares Klimagerät der getrennten Bauart[1990/41]
English:Transferable room air conditioner of split type[1990/41]
French:Appareil de conditionnement d'air transportable du type dit splitté[1990/41]
File destroyed:15.03.1999
Examination procedure04.12.1991Application withdrawn by applicant  [1992/05]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2251960  (SMITH HARRY F);
 [A]US2362698  (HULL HARRY B);
 [Y]US2667765  (HARRIS CHARLES D, et al);
 [A]FR2552862  (FONDERIE SOC GEN DE [FR]);
 [Y]DE8804702U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.