EP0389995 - Isoquinoline derivatives for the treatment of glaucoma or ocular hypertension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.1996 [1996/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSHIN FLOUR MILLING CO., LTD. 19-12, Nihonbashi-koami-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [1990/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tadokoro, Toyohiro 23-16, Midorigaoka 2-chome, Ohi-machi Iruma-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Kiyoshi 18-23, Matsugaoka 5-chome, Tsurugashima-machi Iruma-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Hatakeyama, Shigeki 95-1, Ohaza-Naema, Ohi-machi Iruma-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Kawase, Shigeo 28-5, Suneore-cho 2-chome, Tsurugashima-machi Iruma-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 05 /
Ueno, Masao 37-5, Nakaarai 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90105606.9 | 24.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | JP19890073866 | 28.03.1989 Original published format: JP 7386689 | JP19890242303 | 20.09.1989 Original published format: JP 24230389 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0389995 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0389995 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389995 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, A61K31/05, A61K31/08 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
A61K31/47 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/40] | Title | German: | Isochinolin-Derivate zur Behandlung des Glaukoms oder der okulären Hypertonie | [1990/40] | English: | Isoquinoline derivatives for the treatment of glaucoma or ocular hypertension | [1990/40] | French: | Dérivés de l'isoquinoléine pour le traitement de glaucome ou de l'hypertension oculaire | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4129565 (FUKUSHIMA HIDEO, et al); | [XD]GB2101990 (NISSHIN FLOUR MILLING CO [JP]); | [Y]EP0113910 (NISSHIN FLOUR MILLING CO [JP]); | [Y]FR2447721 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 19, 9th May 1988, page 52, abstract no. 161296q, Columbus, Ohio, US; S. KOHDA et al.: "An ocular toxicity study of (+)-4-(3-tert-butylamino-2-hydroxypropoxy)-2-methyl-1(2H)-isoquinolinone hydrochloride (N-969), a beta-adrenergic blocking agent, in beagle dogs: oral administration for 26 weeks", & OYO YAKURI 1987, 34(6), 553-67 | [A] - Ph. DOROSZ: "Guide pratique des médicaments", 7th edition, 1987, pages 818-819, Maloine S.A., Paris, FR |