Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0392245
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.03.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
28.02.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] |
01.11.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] |
13.10.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] |
11.11.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] |
13.06.1994 |
First examination report |
|
29.06.1992 |
Publication of search report |
published on 19.08.1992 [1992/34] |
13.12.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.01.1991 [1991/05] |
01.09.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] |