EP0390052 - Landmark recognition system and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1993 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | ||
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis MN 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nasr, Hatem N. 7621 Edinborough Way No 2308 Edina, MN 55435 / US | 02 /
Bhanu, Bir 1889 29th NW New Brighton, MN 55112 / US | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Herzbach, Dieter, et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 63008 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 D-63008 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [1990/40] | Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Kaiserleistrasse 39 Postfach 10 08 65 W-6050 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 90105763.8 | 27.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | US19890331710 | 31.03.1989 Original published format: US 331710 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0390052 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0390052 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06F15/70, G05D1/02 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
G06T7/00 (EP,US);
G05D1/0246 (EP,US);
G05D1/027 (EP,US);
G05D1/0274 (EP,US);
G06V20/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/40] | G06K9/00, G06F15/70 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1990/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Marksteinerkennung | [1990/40] | English: | Landmark recognition system and process | [1990/40] | French: | Méthode et système de reconnaissance d'amers | [1990/40] | File destroyed: | 23.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 03.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/45] | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.04.1993 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - IEEE EXPERT. vol. 2, no. 4, 1987NEW YORK US pages 55 - 68; L.S.MCTAMANEY: 'Real-Time Intelligent Control' | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE vol. 10, no. 3, May 1988NEW YORK US pages 362 - 373; C. THORPE ET AL.: 'Vision and Navigation for the Carnegie-Mellon Navlab' |