EP0391210 - Composite element for construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Dämmsysteme GmbH Mittermaierstrasse 18 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | [1994/48] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states Heidelberger Kunststofftechnik GmbH Mittermaierstrasse 18 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states Grimm, Christian Uhlandstrasse 5 D-33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grimm, Christian Uthoffstrasse 44 D-33442 Herzebrock-Clarholz / DE | [1994/49] |
Former [1990/41] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Meyer-Roedern, Giso Bergheimer Strasse 10-12 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Meyer-Roedern, Giso, Dr. Bergheimer Strasse 10-12 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90105782.8 | 27.03.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | DE19890004124U | 04.04.1989 Original published format: DE 8904124 U | [1990/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0391210 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0391210 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0391210 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B32B21/08 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
B32B21/08 (EP,US);
B32B21/047 (US);
B32B21/02 (US);
B32B27/065 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B5/18 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
E04F13/0875 (EP);
B32B2266/0228 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1990/41] | Title | German: | Verbundelement für Bauzwecke | [1990/41] | English: | Composite element for construction | [1990/41] | French: | Elément composite pour la construction | [1990/41] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE7624223U ; | [Y]DE2815091 (KATZ WERKE AG); | [AD]DE3424694 (DEPPRICH HANS) |