EP0390183 - Synchronizing signal separating circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 18, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [1990/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirao, Yoshichika 1-12-8-508 Umegaoka Neyagawa-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Hosoya, Nobukazu 3-3-3 Midorigaoka, Heguri-cho Ikoma-gun, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Amino, Tadashi 1-3-6 Mikagehonmachi, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Ishii, Takaaki 4-8-35-224 Nunoichi-cho Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/40] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90106144.0 | 30.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | JP19890083129 | 31.03.1989 Original published format: JP 8312989 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0390183 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0390183 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390183 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/08 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
H04N5/08 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/40] | Title | German: | Synchronisationssignal-Abtrennschaltung | [1990/40] | English: | Synchronizing signal separating circuit | [1990/40] | French: | Circuit de séparation du signal de synchronisation | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 28.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.07.1996 | IT | 17.07.1996 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 17.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61184055 ; | [Y]FR2595528 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]DE3444764 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 7 (E-469)(2454) 09 January 1987, & JP-A-61 184055 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) 16 August 1986,, & JP61184055 A 19860816 |