Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0392367 | Global Dossier | 15.03.1995 | B1 | EP0392367 | 11.09.1991 | A3 | EP0392367 | 17.10.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4211189 | 11.04.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69017736T | 23.11.1995 | T2 | DE69017736D1 | 20.04.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4211189 | 11.04.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH02133196U | 05.11.1990 | U | Priority number | Date | JP4211189 | 11.04.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5027044 | 25.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4211189 | 11.04.1989 |