EP0450125 - Process of making microcrystalline cubic boron nitride coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Treichel, Helmut Weldishoferstrasse 4 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Spindler, Oswald Lortzingstrasse 16 D-8011 Vaterstetten / DE | 03 /
Braun, Rainer Groschenweg 52 D-8000 München 82 / DE | 04 /
Neureither, Bernhard Weidenerstrasse 5 D-8000 München 83 / DE | 05 /
Kruck, Thomas Am Wachberg 9 D-5042 Erftstadt 18 / DE | [1991/41] | Application number, filing date | 90106584.7 | 06.04.1990 | [1991/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0450125 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450125 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/34 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
C23C16/342 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/43] |
Former [1991/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von mikrokristallin kubischen Bornitridschichten | [1991/41] | English: | Process of making microcrystalline cubic boron nitride coatings | [1991/41] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de couches en nitrure de bore cubique microcristallin | [1991/41] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 23.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, LU, SE | 23.09.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.05.1991 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.1991 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.1991 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.1991 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.1991 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.1991 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.1991 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61153279 ; | [X]JP01116078 ; | [A]JP61149478 ; | [A]US4440108 (LITTLE ROGER G [US], et al) | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, Band 129, Nr. 11, November 1982, Seite 2636, Manchester, US; (W. SCHMOLLA et al.): "Low temperature double-plasma process for BN films on semiconductors" | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 355, 29. November 1986; & JP-A-61 153 279 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO., LTD) 11-07-1986, & JP61153279 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 13, Nr. 339 (C-624)[3687], 31. Juli 1989; & JP-A-01 116 078 (SHIN ETSU CHEM. CO., LTD) 09-05-1989, & JP01116078 A 00000000 | [X] - JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY A, Band 3, Nr. 6, November-Dezember 1985, Seiten 2141-2146, New York, US; (W. HALVERSON et al.): "Effects of charge neutralization on ion-beam-deposited boron nitride films" | [XD] - SOLID-STATE ELECTRONICS, Band 26, Nr. 931, 1983, Seiten 931-939, GB; (W. SCHMOLLA et al.): "Amorphous BN films produced in a double-plasma reactor for semiconductor applications" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 350, 25. Dezember 1984; & JP-A-61 149 478 (FURUKAWA MINING CO., LTD) 08-07-1986, & JP61149478 A 00000000 |