EP0393457 - Proteinase inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNTORY LIMITED 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states SUNTORY LIMITED 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | ||
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states SUNTORY LIMITED 1-40 Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higuchi, Naoki 1-305, 13-23, Ishibashi 2-chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Saitoh, Masayuki 12, 16-16, Fubata-cho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Shibata, Hiroshi F1-502, Nishitomigaoka 2-chome Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90106738.9 | 09.04.1990 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | JP19890089904 | 10.04.1989 Original published format: JP 8990489 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0393457 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393457 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, A61K37/64 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C237/06 (EP,US);
C07C237/22 (EP,US);
C07C271/22 (EP,US);
C07C271/34 (EP,US);
C07F7/081 (EP,US);
C07F9/2458 (EP,US);
C07K5/06043 (EP,US);
C07K5/06191 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07C2603/74 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | Protease-Hemmer | [1990/43] | English: | Proteinase inhibitor | [1990/43] | French: | Inhibiteur de protéases | [1990/43] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 13.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61103897 ; | [A]DE1958383 (ZH BISEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYO KA); | [Y]FR2490632 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) | [Y] - FEBS LETTERS, vol. 195, nos. 1,2, January 1986, pages 265-268, Federation of European Biochemical Societies, Amsterdam, NL; G. CS.-SZABO et al.: "Specific inhibition of human granulocyte elastase with peptide aldhydes" | [A] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 153, no. 3, 30th June 1988, pages 1201-1208, Academic Press, Inc., San Diego, US; T. TSUJINAKA et al.: "Synthesis of a new cell penetrating calpain inhibitor (calpeptin) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 25, 22nd December 1986, page 865, abstract no. 227326w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-61 103 897 (SUNTORY, LTD et al.) 22-05-1986, & JP61103897 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 17, 28th October 1985, page 144, abstract no. 135650c, Columbus, Ohio, US; L. STEARDO et al.: "CCK26-33 degrading activity in brain and nonneural tissue: a metalloendopeptidase", & J. NEUROCHEM. 1985, 45(3), 784-90 |